Here is a comprehensive List of Prime Minister of Pakistan From 1947 To 2023, along with the dates of their respective tenures:
List of Prime Minister of Pakistan From 1947 To 2023
Liaquat Ali Khan (1947-1951)
August 15, 1947, to October 16, 1951
Khawaja Nazimuddin (1951-1953)
October 17, 1951, to April 17, 1953
Muhammad Ali Bogra (1953-1955)
April 17, 1953, to August 12, 1955
Chaudhry Muhammad Ali (1955-1956)
August 12, 1955, to September 12, 1956
Huseyn Shaheed Suhrawardy (1956-1957)
September 12, 1956, to October 17, 1957
Ibrahim Ismail Chundrigar (1957)
October 17, 1957, to December 16, 1957
Feroz Khan Noon (1957-1958)
December 16, 1957, to October 7, 1958
Muhammad Ayub Khan (1958-1962)
October 27, 1958, to June 28, 1962
Nurul Amin (1971-1973)
December 20, 1971, to March 21, 1973
Zulfikar Ali Bhutto (1973-1977)
August 14, 1973, to July 5, 1977
Muhammad Zia-ul-Haq (1977-1988)
July 5, 1977, to August 17, 1988
Benazir Bhutto (1988-1990)
December 2, 1988, to August 6, 1990
Ghulam Mustafa Jatoi (1990)
August 6, 1990, to November 6, 1990
Nawaz Sharif (1990-1993)
November 6, 1990, to April 18, 1993
Balakh Sher Mazari (1993)
April 18, 1993, to May 26, 1993
Benazir Bhuto (1993-1996)
May 26, 1993, to July 18, 1993
Nawaz Sharif (1997-1999)
February 17, 1997, to October 12, 1999
Miraj Khalid (1996-1997)
July 18, 1993, to October 19, 1993
Benazir Bhutto (1993-1996)
October 19, 1993, to November 5, 1996
Malik Meraj Khalid (1996)
November 5, 1996, to February 17, 1997
Pervez Musharraf (1999-2008)
October 12, 1999, to August 18, 2008
Yousaf Raza Gillani (2008-2012)
March 25, 2008, to June 19, 2012
Raja Pervaiz Ashraf (2012-2013)
June 22, 2012, to June 5, 2013
Nawaz Sharif (2013-2017)
June 5, 2013, to July 28, 2017
Shahid Khaqan Abbasi (2017-2018)
August 1, 2017, to May 31, 2018
Nasirul Mulk (2018)
June 1, 2018, to August 18, 2018
Imran Khan (2018-2022)
August 18, 2018, to April 10, 2022
April 11, 2022, to Present